Accounts and annual returns OPERA DA CAMERA

Charity number: 283855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2025 22 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2025 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 January 2025 338 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required