THE ISLAND OF PORTLAND HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Craft workshops Heritage Study centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Dorset
Governance
- 18 December 1981: Standard registration
- ST GEORGE'S CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roy Pepperell | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Algeo-Miles | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Hurst | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Carol Callis | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Norma Ford | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Stone | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stone | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR MARTIN JOHN BLUNDELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.22k | £35.18k | £33.93k | £30.21k | £31.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.97k | £16.45k | £15.35k | £19.71k | £52.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.93k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH NOVEMBER 1981 as amended on 28 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS (INCLUDING THE ARTS OF ARCHITECTURE, PAINTING, SCULPTURE, LITERATURE, MUSIC AND DRAMA) AND ARTISTIC CRAFTS (INCLUDING STONE MASONRY, SPINNING, KNITTING AND WEAVING). (II) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH WILL ENCOURAGE THE EXERCISE AND MAINTAIN THE STANDARDS OF CRAFTS BOTH ANCIENT AND MODERN AND TO PRESERVE IMPROVE CRAFTMANSHIP AND FURTHUR PROMOTE AND INCREASE THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC THEREIN. (III) TO SECURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GEOLOGICAL BOTANICAL SCIENTIFIC HISTORIC AND ARCHAEOLOGICAL INTEREST IN THE ISLAND OF PORTLAND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Island Of Portland Heritage Trust
St George's Centre
Reforne
PORTLAND
Dorset
DT5 2AN
- Phone:
- 01305823406
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window