Trustees THE ISLAND OF PORTLAND HERITAGE TRUST
Charity number: 283881

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roy Pepperell | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Algeo-Miles | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Hurst | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Carol Callis | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Norma Ford | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Stone | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stone | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR MARTIN JOHN BLUNDELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.