Accounts and annual returns BRISTOL DISC (DIABETES SUPPORT FOR CHILDREN) GROUP

Charity Number: 283884
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 19 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 09 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 14 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 13 February 2013 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required