STOKE HILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Stoke Hill Community Association has its home at St Katherine's Priory, St Katherine's Road, Exeter, Devon EX4 7JY - Activities run at the centre include - Bingo / Community Cafe / Community Garden / Craft and Hobby Activities / Open Days / Kenpo Karate / Exeter Model Engineering Society / The Exeter Miniature Railway / 72A Model Railway Club / Whist and many other community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 30 December 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ces Courtney | Chair | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Pete Hackney | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emmerence Hovell | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Stewart Rockey | Trustee | 25 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claude Loren Todd Gray | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul Crispin | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELEANOR DANKS | Trustee | 08 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE MARGARET GIBBONS | Trustee | 19 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM FLOWER | Trustee | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.41k | £22.19k | £24.80k | £30.69k | £38.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.38k | £21.76k | £28.48k | £28.96k | £27.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.78k | £19.23k | £6.95k | £3.45k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 April 2022 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH JUNE 1978, AND AMENDED 25TH JUNE 1980 AND 29TH OCTOBER 1981 AS AMENDED 17 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STOKE HILL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATION OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FAXILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
STOKE HILL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
137 St. Katherines Road
EXETER
EX4 7JJ
- Phone:
- 07815 016806
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window