BISLEY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Normal WI programme
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 08 March 1982: Standard registration
- BISLEY W I (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TINA GULL | Chair | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE EVANS | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
TINA HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
KAREN MIMMS | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELLIS | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY KNELLER | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
LADY SUSAN LEIGH | Trustee | 11 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN VAUGHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH AUDREY COLVIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAMELA SUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA GWENDOLINE ROTHWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.23k | £1.06k | £4.29k | £8.06k | £8.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.46k | £1.21k | £4.24k | £8.29k | £7.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 22 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RUAL LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE.
Area of benefit
BISLEY AND ITS SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Elder Road
Bisley
WOKING
GU24 9HB
- Phone:
- 01483472595
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window