HEVINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 283915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A Village Hall for the use of the inhabitants of the area for their benefit and for forms of recreational use.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,207
Total expenditure: £4,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 January 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAMON SUMMERS Chair 10 June 2024
None on record
Melanie Summers Trustee 10 June 2024
None on record
Shane Ward Trustee 14 April 2023
None on record
David Holmes Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.27k £24.04k £17.35k £14.50k £1.21k
Total expenditure £11.34k £8.76k £7.56k £20.01k £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.91k £8.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 June 2024 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2023 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2023 717 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hevingham Village Hall
Brick Kiln Road
Hevingham
Norwich
Norfolk
Phone:
07818801164