Financial history THE THRANGU RIMPOCHE TRUST

Charity number: 283921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.94k £14.79k £12.68k £17.93k £10.82k
Total expenditure £46.56k £27.02k £24.65k £45.51k £39.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A