THE THRANGU RIMPOCHE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Thrangu Rinpoche Trust was set up to facilitate the teaching of Buddhism and meditation. The charity furthers the work of HHVVK Thrangu Rinpoche. The Trust supports our resident Tibetan Lama, who teaches meditation and also performs ceremonies for birth, marriage, and death. The long-term goal of the Trust is the founding of a Buddhist Monastery to support an established Buddhist community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 04 March 1982: Standard registration
- THE THRANGU RINPOCHE TRUST (Working name)
- THRANGU HOUSE (Working name)
- THRANGU RINPOCHE TRUST (Working name)
- THRANGU TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Moti Gurung | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Hom Bahadur Gurung | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sherab Yungdong | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.94k | £14.79k | £12.68k | £17.93k | £10.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.56k | £27.02k | £24.65k | £45.51k | £39.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST DECEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ACCORDING TO THE KARMA KAGYU SCHOOL OF BUDDHISM IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thrangu House Buddhist Centre
42 Magdalen Road
OXFORD
OX4 1RB
- Phone:
- 01865241555
- Email:
- info@thranguhouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window