PHAB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Phab supports a network of around 150 clubs in all age ranges, offering activities which all members can share and enjoy together. Phab runs the Integrated Living Experiences and Skills for Independence projects at fully accessible activity centres. Phab organises conferences and forums across the regions, with workshops, training, advice and group discussions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£731,028
Donations and legacies | £660.47k | |
Charitable activities | £60.50k | |
Other trading activities | £4.39k | |
Investments | £3.25k | |
Other | £2.41k |
Total expenditure:
£879,748
Raising funds | £302.11k | |
Charitable activities | £577.64k | |
Other | £0 |
£5,026 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £302.11k | |
Charitable expenditure | £577.64k |
People

7 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 January 1982: Standard registration
- 16 January 2013: Funds received from 1037716 HAVERING ALBERMARLE PHAB CLUB
- 27 January 2022: Funds received from 262288 THE READING PHAB CLUB
- 09 March 2022: Funds received from 1065761 CENTRAL LONDON PHAB CLUB
- 15 November 2022: Funds received from 515204 WREXHAM AND DISTRICT PHAB CLUB
- 13 October 2023: Funds received from 1000485 ABERCONWY PHAB CLUB
- 02 January 2024: Funds received from 213990 THE LONSDALE TRUST WALLASEY
- 02 May 2024: Funds received from 1063240 ANDOVER PHAB
- 03 July 2024: Funds received from 1059440 HALTON PHAB CLUB
- PHAB (Working name)
- PHAB ENGLAND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natalie Anne Louise Osborne | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Robinson | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Maloney | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Francis Howell | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Elizabeth Howell | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULIA GILES MBE | Trustee | 30 March 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £935.15k | £549.32k | £462.39k | £644.19k | £731.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £907.17k | £613.25k | £559.07k | £584.52k | £879.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £158.52k | £50.06k | £4.45k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £824.95k | £373.66k | N/A | £582.15k | £660.47k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £36.55k | £507 | N/A | £19.44k | £4.39k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £43.52k | £23.90k | N/A | £37.78k | £60.50k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £28.68k | £17.37k | N/A | £303 | £3.25k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.45k | £133.89k | N/A | £4.52k | £2.41k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £59.06k | £1.68k | N/A | £2.35k | £24.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £687.66k | £310.34k | N/A | £413.44k | £577.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £219.51k | £302.91k | N/A | £171.08k | £302.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.71k | £11.97k | N/A | £10.23k | £8.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £69.96k | £35.63k | N/A | £27.91k | £9.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £145.18k | £133.48k | N/A | £114.87k | £108.21k | |
|
Long-term investments | £266.60k | £325.10k | N/A | £273.10k | £278.13k | |
|
Other assets | £532.51k | £490.36k | N/A | £405.75k | £282.06k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£50.77k | -£42.85k | N/A | -£5.47k | -£2.61k | |
|
Total liabilities | £21.48k | £39.48k | N/A | £10.65k | £31.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH NOVEMBER 1981 as amended on 22 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ILLNESS, SICKNESS AND SUFFERING ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD OF PHYSICALLY DISABLED PERSONS. (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY BRINGING THE DISABLED INTO CLOSER ASSOCIATION AND INTEGRATION WITH THE ABLE BODIED SO THAT THE FORMER WILL HAVE OPPORTUNITIES OF OVERCOMING THEIR DISABILITIES AND THE LATTER WILL BENEFIT FROM SUCH ASSOCIATION AND INTEGRATION. (C) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PERSONS FOR WHOM SUCH FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED BEING PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES PROVIDED THAT NEVERTHELESS SUCH FACILITIES SHALL BE AVAILABLE TO THE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Phab Ltd C/O The Building Society
241 The Broadway
LONDON
SW19 1SD
- Phone:
- 02086679443
- Email:
- info@phab.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window