DISABLEMENT INFORMATION ADVICE LINE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE (CORBY)

Charity Number: 283957
Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

DIAL (Corby) is a self regulated, registered charity which is run by unpaid, disabled, voluntary staff. Our primary function is to help disabled, elderly or chronically ill people to receive the state benefits, assistance, advice or other help they may be entitled to free of charge.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021

Total income: £156
Total expenditure: £95

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 February 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • D.I.A.L CORBY (Working name)
  • DISABLEMENT INFORMATION AND ADVICE LINE CORBY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALEXANDER MCNICOL Chair
None on record
SUE FOCKE Trustee
None on record
STUART BULLOCH Trustee
None on record
MRS VAL MCNICOL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £360 £625 £540 £212 £156
Total expenditure £285 £545 £220 £212 £95
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 837 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 March 2022 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 March 2022 408 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DIAL CORBY
RESOURCE CENTRE
PATRICK ROAD
CORBY
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
NN18 9NT
Phone:
07391622504
Website:

No information available