CORNWORTHY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manage and maintain Cornworthy Village Hall. The hall is available for public hire and is used by a number of organisations/societies for sport and leisure activities as well as private parties. It is also the local polling station. The Committee holds fund raising events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £10,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 07 November 1982: Standard registration
- CORNWORTHY VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Andrew Carter | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Verity Isitt | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Kidd | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Sean Bailey | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Elizabeth Reid | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Hilary Gay Tuppen | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Donne Baker | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.05k | £11.34k | £2.08k | £16.98k | £43.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.59k | £3.46k | £3.61k | £11.67k | £43.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £9.33k | N/A | N/A | £10.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CORNWORTHY IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON WITHOUT DESTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR ALL OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CORNWORTHY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cornworthy Village Hall
Cornworthy
TOTNES
Devon
TQ9 7ES
- Phone:
- 01803722232
- Website:
-
cornworthyvillagehall.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window