THE FRIENDS OF ST MARTIN'S CHURCH, DORKING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity is to raise funds for the preserving, maintaining and renewing of the building of the Church of St. Martin's Dorking, and its fabric, furniture and fittings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 03 March 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LADY ALEXANDRA MARY WEDGWOOD | Chair |
|
||||||
Ernest Rodney Shaw | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Rev Canon Anthony Christopher Rustell | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|||||
GERALDINE ANNIE MACLEOD | Trustee | 28 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH LLOYD-KENDALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW JAMES DORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.48k | £17.13k | £15.41k | £16.54k | £31.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.17k | £790 | £6.25k | £64.37k | £1.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2ND DECEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 8TH JULY 1998
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE (IF AND INSOFAR AS THE SAME SHALL BE CHARITABLE) OF PRESERVING, MAINTAINING AND RENEWING THE BUILDING OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARTIN'S, DORKING AND ITS FABRIC, FURNITURE AND FITTINGS.
Area of benefit
DORKING
Contact information
- Address:
-
27-29 DENE STREET
DORKING
RH4 2BZ
- Phone:
- 01306501060
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window