Accounts and annual returns ISLAHUL MUSLIMEEN

Charity Number: 283991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window