Financial history RUDHAM AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL FUND

Charity Number: 284002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.88k £10.36k £12.54k £6.08k £8.34k
Total expenditure £5.04k £6.14k £9.31k £7.20k £5.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A