RUDHAM AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing and maintaining the facilities of the Village Hall to East and West Rudham and the surrounding Villages. There is no bar in the hall. There is ample parking.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 12 January 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Tizard | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Dalton | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Austin | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Oddy | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrica Davis | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eunice Abrahams | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian McCallum | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN R DAWSON | Trustee | 01 July 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.88k | £10.36k | £12.54k | £6.08k | £8.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.04k | £6.14k | £9.31k | £7.20k | £5.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 16 February 2023 | 353 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 February 2023 | 718 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 1 DECEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF EAST AND WEST RUDHAM HOUGHTON AND COXFORD IN NORFOLK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF WEST RUDHAM, EAST RUDHAM, HOUGHTON AND COXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
LIME HOUSE
THE GREEN
EAST RUDHAM
KING'S LYNN
PE31 8RD
- Phone:
- 01485528356
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window