REMOVERS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing relief for necessitous persons(including their widows or dependents) who are, or have been engaged continuously for a minimum period of two years by any member of the British Association of Removers Ltd
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 March 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA MICHELLE LANE | Chair | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Linda Hayes | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gavin McCarthy | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Taylor | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.85k | £7.80k | £5.55k | £12.08k | £32.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.77k | £1.91k | £4.90k | £12.63k | £28.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 December 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REMOVERS BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION RULES (REVISED 1977) AS AMENDED 15TH NOVEMBER 1981 AND REVISED1986, JUNE 1997 AND 15 MAY 2010.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE FOR NECESSITOUS PERSONS, INCLUDING THEIR SPOUSES AND DEPENDANT CHILDREN, WHO ARE, OR HAVE BEEN, EMPLOYED CONTINUOUSLY FOR A PERIOD OF NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS BY A CURRENT MEMBER OF THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF REMOVERS LTD (BAR).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TANGENT HOUSE
62 EXCHANGE ROAD
WATFORD
HERTS
WD18 0TG
- Phone:
- 01923699480
- Email:
- rba@bar.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window