Accounts and annual returns THE MICROPALAEONTOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 284013
Charity reporting is up to date (61 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 November 2023 04 November 2024 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 November 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 November 2024 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 November 2022 12 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 November 2021 10 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 November 2020 07 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 November 2019 13 October 2020 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 November 2019 13 October 2020 39 days late Download Open in new window