Trustees THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE NEWTON ABBOT HOSPITALS
Charity number: 284014

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Robinson | Chair | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Honeywill | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Leaman | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Kennedy | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Sylvia Gibbs | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Ryan | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MRS J LARCOMBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLE HEWETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JASMINE HELLYER GEAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN LONG | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.