Financial history HUNTLEY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (PTFA)

Charity number: 284015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.80k £8.13k £10.76k £9.38k £12.98k
Total expenditure £8.31k £6.11k £4.66k £11.38k £9.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A