Accounts and annual returns THE MAINGOT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 284017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 October 2023 20 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2023 20 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 October 2022 24 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2022 24 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 October 2021 25 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2021 25 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 October 2020 16 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2020 16 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 October 2019 20 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2019 20 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window