THE FORTUNE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects are to pay the income and capital as the Trustees may in their absolute discretion think fit to such charities or for such charitable purposes and in such manner and subject to such terms and conditions as the Trustees determine. Trustee's Do Not Accept Unsolicited Appeals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 March 1982: Standard registration
- 06 March 2023: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210.25k | £1.90k | £201.28k | £5.60k | £3.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.99k | £500 | £200.00k | £4.40k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 24 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | 24 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 10 DECEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 5 OCTOBER 2016
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window