FOREST GREEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of Village Hall for meetings, lectures, classes and other forms of recreational and leisure-time activities for the inhabitants of Forest Green.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 April 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY CHARLES MAY | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gaye Lucy Collis | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM JOHN CLAYTON | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Elizabeth Harber-Baker | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.65k | £2.34k | £8.78k | £7.76k | £6.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.13k | £5.68k | £3.36k | £8.56k | £4.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 8TH OCTOBER 1981
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF FOREST GREEN IN THE COUNTY OF SURREY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPIONIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
FOREST GREEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Horsham Road
Forest Green
Dorking
Surrey
RH5 5RZ
- Phone:
- 01306621214
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window