FRIENDS OF SHENSTONE AND SVF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends fundraise to support the purchasing of specialised equipment for Shenstone School pupils. They also help fund the purchase and maintenance of school buses, and play equipment for outside areas. Shenstone is a school for pupils aged 2 to 11 with severe learning difficulties. The school operates across two sites, Shenstone School (Crayford) and Shenstone Early Years Centre (Sidcup).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Bexley
Governance
- 23 March 1982: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF SHENSTONE (Previous name)
- SHENSTONE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Warner | Chair | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Faye Bearsby | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leann Bargery | Trustee | 20 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Bissett | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lori Mackey | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.35k | £36.40k | £8.72k | £14.70k | £17.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.66k | £32.98k | £23.19k | £17.93k | £5.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 16 March 2021 | 289 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/11/1981 AS AMENDED ON 09/01/1996 AS AMENDED ON 20/11/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AN ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOR NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O SHENSTONE SCHOOL
94 OLD ROAD
CRAYFORD
KENT
DA1 4DY
- Phone:
- 01322524145
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window