JOHN HENRY CARTWRIGHT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual grant to residents of Harkstead of and over the age of 65 years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 February 1982: Standard registration
- JACK CARTWRIGHT CHARITY (Working name)
- JACKIE CARTWRIGHT CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Donnison | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
EDWIN JOHN ARDERN | Trustee | 02 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
VICTOR EDWARD LAST | Trustee | 01 May 1986 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWARD ABBOTT | Trustee | 01 May 1986 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.93k | £1.94k | £3.23k | £2.10k | £2.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.47k | £1.58k | £2.10k | £2.21k | £3.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT IPSWICH ON 23RD MAY 1973 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 1ST MAY 1986
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF HARKSTEAD IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK WITH A PREFERENCE FOR SUCH PERSONS OVER 75 YEARS OF AGE.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF HARKSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Abrahams Cottages
FORDWELLS
WITNEY
Oxfordshire
OX29 9PT
- Phone:
- 01993 878240
- Email:
- victorlast@aol.com
- Website:
-
None
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window