EDWARD C OLDHAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
specialising in small financial grants to small, non national, local, independent charities working in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Cornwall
- Cumbria
- Stockport
- Tameside
Governance
- 19 March 1982: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD ANTHONY LIVESEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOCELYN CARNEGIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.25k | £4.33k | £4.42k | £6.77k | £6.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.47k | £2.83k | £3.33k | £8.15k | £7.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DEED DATED 28TH AUGUST 1962
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY INCOME TO OR FOR SUCH OF THE INSTITUTIONS ORGANISATIONS AND BODIES NAMED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THE SETTLEMENT DEED AS SHALL FOR THE TIME BEING HAVE OBJECTS WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AND SHALL BE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE FOR THE PURPOSES AND WITHIN THE MEAINING OF THE INCOME TAX ACT 1952 OR AN ACT FOR THE TIME BEING AMENDING RE-ENACTING OR REPLACING THE SAME AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS BODIES OR PURPOSES (IF ANY) AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSULUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 COLLEGE HILL
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B73 6HA
- Phone:
- 01213549667
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window