MEAD COUNTY INFANT SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for educational purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 April 1982: Standard registration
- THE MEAD P A (Working name)
- MEAD COUNTY FIRST SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cheryl Worthington | Chair | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Selina Lee | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sofia Fernandes | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.96k | £4.12k | £11.26k | £21.53k | £19.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.91k | £3.51k | £3.31k | £18.43k | £17.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH DECEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED ON 28TH MARCH 1994, AS AMENDED ON 22ND SEPTEMBER 1994 AND 22ND DECEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Mead Infant School
Newbury Gardens
EPSOM
KT19 0QG
- Phone:
- 020 8224 5640
- Email:
- themeadpa@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window