Financial history THE BARN THEATRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 284143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £126.61k £52.62k £117.54k £207.41k £238.11k
Total expenditure £104.86k £62.76k £122.16k £161.35k £176.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.24k £2.67k N/A N/A