Financial history THE SHEPHERDS PURSE TRUST

Charity number: 284154
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.76k £8.59k £6.71k £2.33k £1.20k
Total expenditure £23.63k £12.40k £8.82k £2.50k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A