THE EXETER CANAL AND QUAY TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation of land, buildings around the Canal and Quay Basin The promotion and encouragement of high standards of architecture The promotion of educational and cultural activities and support of community participation in any form of healthy recreation, including waterborne sports The education of the public about the historic trade passing through Canal and Quay.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 18 February 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN WILLIAMSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Councillor Matthew Williams | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Anne Margaret Jobson | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Tessa Read | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Martyn Snow | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Ruth Williams | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Laura Charis Adelaide Wright | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Christina Lorraine Wyse | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Bell | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Philip Bialyk | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROGER JOHNSON | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tony Wardle | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £378.17k | £313.52k | £639.24k | £306.25k | £352.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £294.77k | £357.48k | £556.12k | £468.61k | £251.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.00k | N/A | £39.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £39.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £307.92k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £292.13k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £241.70k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £314.42k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £172.89k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 DECEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 2 APRIL 2001, 8 MAY 2007 AND 22 MARCH 2010.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED TO:1)THE PRESERVATION OF LAND, BUILDINGS, AND OTHER FEATURES OF BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST IN OR AROUND THE EXETER CANAL AND QUAY BASIN(THE AREA).20 THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE, BUILDING AND TOWN PLANNING AND THE PROMOTION OF CIVIC PRIDE IN THE AREA.3)THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF MUSICAL, ARTISTIC, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER CULTURAL ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE AREA.4)THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN ANY FORM OF HEALTHY RECREATION, INCLUDING WATERBORNE SPORTS IN THE AREA.5)THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE HISTORIC TRADE PASSING THROUGH EXETER CANAL AND QUAY AND THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF BUILDINGS OF HISTORIC INTEREST CONNECTED WITH THAT TRADE , WHETHER OR NOT WITHIN THE AREA.
Area of benefit
EXETER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Custom House Vistor Centre
Custom House
46 The Quay
EXETER
EX2 4AN
- Phone:
- 07814463298
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window