THE 1570 FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 09 February 1982: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4TH APRIL 1979
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT, PRESERVATION AND PROMOTION OF THE ANCIENT RITES OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH AND IN PARTICULAR THE TRADITIONAL DOCTRINE AND MORAL AND SOCIAL TEACHINGS OF THAT CHURCH PARTICULARLY THE FOURTH LATERAN COUNCIL THE COUNCIL OF TRENT AND THE FIRST VATICAN COUNCIL AND THE CONTINUED USE OF THE TRADITIONAL AND UNALTERED ROMAN CATHOLIC CATECHISM BASED ON THE CATECHISM OF THE COUNCIL OF TRENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window