THE CRANLEIGH ARTS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, present and inspire education, exhibition, performance and participation of the Arts and other leisure time activities (apart from sport) for all ages of the inhabitants of Cranleigh and its surrounding villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £48,468 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
99 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 April 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Freeston | Chair | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BROUGH SCOTT | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Arvon Chapman | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Richard Leslie Everitt | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Stephanie Gallo | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Frogatt | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Florence Heslop | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £322.77k | £40.40k | £235.67k | £516.37k | £416.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £342.32k | £83.66k | £232.81k | £366.82k | £875.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.00k | £22.00k | £35.67k | £165.85k | £48.47k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £205.52k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £73.81k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £232.35k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.70k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £126.99k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £33.67k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.53k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £206.16k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14TH JANUARY 1982 AS AMENDED ON 8TH JULY 1996
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE OF ARTISTIC TASTE AND KNOWLEDGE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FACILITATING OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES (APART FROM SPORT) FOR THE INHABITANTS OF CRANLEIGH AND DISTRICT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (FOR DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
CRANLEIGH AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CRANLEIGH ARTS CENTRE LTD
1 HIGH STREET
CRANLEIGH
GU6 8AS
- Phone:
- 01483 278000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window