BECCLES CENTRE FOR DISABLED PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity runs a day centre for disabled people open two days each week throughout the year. Various activities are organised, including a programme of outings during the summer months. The charity owns a mini-bus and provides transport for members. The day centre building and minibus have also been used by other groups of disabled people such as the Stroke Club, St Raphaels etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 February 1982: Standard registration
- THE MAY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Forster-Warnes | Chair | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE SUSAN SMITH-HOWELL | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Smith | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Nicholas Markland | Trustee | 09 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Wilson | Trustee | 17 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANN HILL | Trustee | 04 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.57k | £16.10k | £11.58k | £16.32k | £15.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.76k | £16.29k | £10.17k | £15.04k | £14.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH JANUARY 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE DISABLED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAYBE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE, WITHIN THE TOWN OF BECCLES AND WITHIN THE AREA AROUND IT, AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A MEETING PLACE FOR DISABLED PEOPLE OF THE AREA WITH AMENITIES AND SCOPE TO ASSIST THEM IN LEADING A FULLER LIFE.
Area of benefit
THE TOWN OF BECCLES AND WITHIN THE AREA AROUND IT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The May Centre for Disabled People
Ken Markland Way
Common Lane South
Beccles
Suffolk
NR34 9BU
- Phone:
- 01502712173
- Email:
- bmaycentre333@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window