SOUTHWICK (SUSSEX) SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society is the local amenity society for Southwick promoting good standards of planning, protection of the environment and local heritage, and public interest in these matters. It has a lease on the Manor Cottage which it runs as a local heritage centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- West Sussex
Governance
- 19 May 1982: Standard registration
- SOUTHWICK SOCIETY (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY CANDY | Chair | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Fiona Hilditch | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jeanette Elizabeth Brazier | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
JOHN YOUNG | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
TREVOR BURCHELL | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
JO HARRISON | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Pamela Margaret Coppelman | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Amanda Katherine Evans | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
NIGEL FRANCIS DIVERS | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
PROF RAY RICHARDS BSC, MSC, PHD, DSC, FRSC | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Karen Hewitt | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.57k | £12.34k | £7.82k | £59.73k | £6.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.89k | £6.58k | £8.36k | £11.48k | £11.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH MARCH 1980
Charitable objects
A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
SOUTHWICK AND FISHERGATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
93 EASTERN AVENUE
SHOREHAM-BY-SEA
BN43 6PE
- Phone:
- 01273465164
- Email:
- nigeldivers@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window