THE ASSOCIATION FOR CHRISTIAN CONFERENCES, TEACHING AND SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Works in support of Christians and chaplaincies in the armed forces around the world but primarily in Africa, Europe, South Asia and the Middle East.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Armenia
- Belarus
- Bhutan
- Bulgaria
- Cameroon
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Egypt
- France
- Germany
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- India
- Israel
- Jordan
- Kosovo
- Moldova
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Ukraine
- United States
Governance
- 25 March 1982: Standard registration
- 16 April 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 16 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1200420 MILITARY MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL
- MILITARY MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.43k | £142.06k | £191.32k | £191.32k | £155.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.38k | £158.83k | £140.56k | £140.56k | £152.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20/12/1974 AS AMENDED ON 15/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 11/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/07/2013 AS AMENDED ON 10 NOV 2015
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window