Governing document THE ASSOCIATION FOR CHRISTIAN CONFERENCES, TEACHING AND SERVICES
Charity number: 284203
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20/12/1974 AS AMENDED ON 15/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 11/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/07/2013 AS AMENDED ON 10 NOV 2015
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.