THE CHARLES WARNER MEMORIAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes small awards to young people who live, work or go to school in the ancient parish of Farnham Royal, Bucks, usually for character building expeditions, educational courses or for help with books etc to further their education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 29 March 1982: Standard registration
- 09 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14 | £15 | £14 | £2.11k | £1.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £300 | £1.16k | £0 | £1.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 05 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 01 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17TH NOVEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF TWENTY-SIX YEARS WHO RESIDE HAVE ATTENDED SCHOOL OR WHO WORK IN THE ANCIENT ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FARNHAM ROYAL.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FARNHAM ROYAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window