Financial history BOX, COLERNE AND RUDLOE LINK SCHEME

Charity number: 284243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.49k £4.33k £7.80k £7.19k £11.95k
Total expenditure £17.69k £4.11k £6.97k £11.12k £10.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A