Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ASHBURTON PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 284245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 25 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 February 2025 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 October 2024 488 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 October 2024 488 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 July 2023 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window