RESTORATION TRUST FOR THE CHURCH OF ST MARY'S OF REDENHALL WITH HARLESTON AND WORTWELL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money for the preservation of the fabric and building of the Church of St. Mary, Redenhall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Norfolk
Governance
- 14 April 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN EDWARDS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Valerie Burrell | Trustee | 03 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL JEREMY CLARK | Trustee | 18 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNE SCOTT ADKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA LEGRYS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ANNE NEEVE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.73k | £1.47k | £7.33k | £7.19k | £17.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £637 | £13.95k | £1.98k | £9.35k | £12.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2ND FEBRUARY 1982 AND SCHEME OF 16TH JULY 1986
Charitable objects
FOR SAVING MAINTAINING AND IMPROVING THE FABRIC FIXTURES AND FITTINGS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARYS OF REDENHALL WITH HARLESTON AND WORWELL BY GRANTS OF MONEY OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
88 LOW ROAD
WORTWELL
HARLESTON
IP20 0HJ
- Phone:
- 01986788326
- Email:
- gordon.ellis9@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window