LODGE OF COURAGE NUMBER 8957 BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 March 1982: Standard registration
- 05 February 2007: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF DEED OF TRUST DATED 9TH DECEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
TO APPLY BOTH THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE BENEVOLENT FUND TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF SUCH POOR AND DISTRESSED BROTHER MASONS OR THEIR POOR AND DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE LODGE SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window