Governing document MEDWAY VOLUNTEER CENTRE
Charity Number: 284288

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/01/1982 AS AMENDED ON 10/03/1982 AS AMENDED ON 16/06/1983 AS AMENDED ON 17/12/1997 AS AMENDED ON 24/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2009 AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2010 AS AMENDED ON 28/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/2012
Charitable objects
TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK IN SOCIAL SERVICES AND SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AMONGST THOSE CLASSES IN NEED THEREOF.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CHATHAM, ROCHESTER, STROOD AND ADJACENT PARISHES WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF MEDWAY,
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.