THE HEATHERSIDE SCHOOLS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising events within the school that include Summer & Christmas fairs, pupil discos and parties and family or adult evening events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 12 May 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angie Hadden | Chair | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathy McDougall | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aimee Beaumont | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Criddle | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Britten | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Tarrant | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Clarke | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SARAH NAPIER | Trustee | 02 October 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.60k | £23.78k | £11.15k | £46.11k | £58.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.35k | £21.75k | £25.88k | £17.31k | £51.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 10 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/09/1981 AS AMENDED ON 03/10/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOLS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE HEATHERSIDE SCHOOLS (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heatherside Infant School
Reading Road South
FLEET
GU52 7TH
- Phone:
- 01252 617101
- Email:
- your.heatherside@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window