Governing document BESTOBELL-MEGGITT WELFARE TRUST
Charity Number: 284376

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH SPTEMBER I948 SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 6TH OCTOBER 1949 AS VARIED BY DEEDS OF 28TH JANUARY 1982,28TH JANUARY 1988,2ND NOVEMBER 1992 AND 3RD FEBRUARY 1993
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP, FINANCIAL NEED OR SICKNESS OF THE BENEFICIARIES (AS DEFINED IN THE DEED DATED 28TH JANUARY 1982).
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.