LANGTON HERRING VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Langton Herring Village Hall provides a centre for all residents to meet, socialise and exercise. It offers a suitable location for the various village clubs from Table tennis, Art, Choir, Gardening and Talks on a regular basis. It is also a regular meeting place for external groups including the Parish Council and occasional visits from the local MP.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 11 March 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDY PENELOPE BARRETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mike Standring | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Eastwood | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tim Warren | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Penny Viney | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Baker | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Fielding | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MILTON | Trustee | 25 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS J. ADAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.13k | £10.53k | £4.29k | £3.50k | £14.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.23k | £3.21k | £2.91k | £4.36k | £12.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 20TH FEBRUARY 1974
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LANGTON HERRING WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLICITAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LANGTON HERRING
Contact information
- Address:
-
SAVONA
LANGTON HERRING
WEYMOUTH
DT3 4JA
- Phone:
- 01305871202
- Email:
- miltonsheila143@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window