JAMIAT-UL-MUSLEMEEN QUWAT-UL-ISLAM MASJED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To provide facilities for the daily, Friday and festival prayers 2. The establishment of an Islamic Centre 3. The provision of facilities for the practice of the Islamic faith 4. The facilitation of communal activities 5. The provision and facilitation of Islamic education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 12 May 1979: Standard registration
- CRAWLEY MOSQUE (Working name)
- JAMIAT-UL-MUSLIMEEN AND QUWAT-UL-ISLAM MASJID (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arif Syed | Chair | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shafiq Ahmed | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
QAMER FARDOOS | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sajjad Anwar | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abid Sayyad | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED MUNIR KHAN | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ansar Ali | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Asad Masood Satti | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zafar Satti | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Irfan Bhatti | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Abu Saleh | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED UBAID KHAN | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zulfiqar Ahmed | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £249.57k | £249.91k | £315.01k | £282.14k | £324.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.23k | £204.54k | £254.31k | £254.62k | £252.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.14k | £13.98k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 31 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 31 July 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 12TH FEBRUARY 1982 AS AMENDED 27TH SEPTEMBER 1999, 14TH NOVEMBER 1999 AND 28TH JUNE 2005. as amended on 14 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crawley Mosque
Broadwood Rise
Broadfield
CRAWLEY
RH11 9SE
- Phone:
- 01293 553070
- Email:
- info@crawleymosque.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window