Accounts and annual returns EXETER AND EAST DEVON SPORTS ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED

Charity number: 284400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2025 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required