Financial history EXETER AND EAST DEVON SPORTS ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED

Charity number: 284400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.27k £184 £1.35k £1.20k £940
Total expenditure £9.97k £839 £4.03k £7.27k £4.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A