Financial history Watercress Line Heritage Railway Trust Limited

Charity number: 284406
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.87m £3.10m £4.64m £3.91m £3.85m
Total expenditure £4.43m £2.71m £3.78m £4.91m £3.42m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £25.00k £25.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £790.00k £9.23k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £360.99k £354.48k £844.94k £679.88k £1.12m
Income - Other trading activities £4.44m £2.70m £3.74m £3.18m £2.67m
Income - Charitable activities £60.19k £45.96k £56.74k £44.73k £37.51k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.04k £460 £970 £6.92k £18.41k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.10k
Income - Legacies £155.53k £281.34k £361.78k £24.46k £735.12k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £223.32k £100.82k £109.73k £936.45k £141.49k
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.21m £2.61m £3.67m £3.97m £3.28m
Expenditure - Governance £9.59k £19.38k £40.29k £35.61k £41.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.00k £4.22k £3.33k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0