BOURNEMOUTH MUSIC COMPETITIONS FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes the development of performance in the Performing Arts, primarily by young people, through the provision of a public stage for performance, with constructive adjudications by Adjudicators of National repute. Activity is enhanced by competition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
Governance
- 23 April 1982: Standard registration
- BMCF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lawrence Williams | Chair | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tina Reyes | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacky Thorne | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Southon | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon David Freeman | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenni French | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Wilson | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Hazel Bayliss | Trustee | 02 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WATERS | Trustee | 16 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER STARK | Trustee | 16 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.24k | £11.11k | £56 | £28.13k | £20.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.92k | £4.16k | £2.14k | £33.32k | £19.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPED 4TH JANUARY 1982
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF MUSIC, SPEECH AND DRAMA, AND DANCE, IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Leeson Road
Bournemouth
BH7 7AY
- Phone:
- 01202556023
- Email:
- bmthfestival@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window